AGE WELL WEST KENT

Charity Number: 1179948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Health and social care support for people aged 50 years and over in West Kent.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 September 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin John Charles Pharoah Trustee 28 October 2021
None on record
Sandra Jacqueline Wisdom Trustee 28 October 2021
None on record
Nigel Morris Stratton Trustee 08 June 2018
AGE UK TUNBRIDGE WELLS
Received: On time
SOUTHBOROUGH AND HIGH BROOMS AGE CONCERN
Received: On time
THE GOLDSMITH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE DEBNEY ENDOWMENT TRUST
Received: On time
PEMBURY PAVILION JOINT MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE
Received: On time
CHARLES AMHERST'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 17/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 17 March 2020 04 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Wood Street
Tunbridge Wells
Kent
TN1 2QS
Phone:
01892 522591