THE HILLFIELDS MUSLIM ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of Islamic values and education of Muslims living in the Hillfields area of Coventry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 26 January 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr FARUK SULEMAN | Trustee | 25 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ISUF MUSA KATHAWALA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.69k | £50.78k | £71.70k | £71.81k | £83.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.18k | £42.89k | £63.39k | £66.95k | £75.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.31k | £1.14k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 OCTOBER 1981 AS AMENDED 3 JANUARY 1982 AND 26 JUNE 1986.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE MUSLIM RELIGION IN THE HILLFIELDS AREA OF THE CITY OF COVENTRY BY THE PROVISION OF A MOSQUE, OF A BURIAL GROUND, OF EDUCATION IN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE MUSLIM FAITH AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL THINK FIT. PLEASE SEE CONSTITUTION FOR FURTHER DETAILS.
Area of benefit
HILLFIELDS AREA OF THE CITY OF COVENTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Hillfields Muslim Association
1-5 Berry Street
COVENTRY
CV1 5JT
- Phone:
- 07481 683601
- Email:
- Masjidezakariya@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window