COUNTRYMEN UK

Charity number: 1184921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Countrymen UK use the farm and countryside environments help to meet the challenges being faced by men who find themselves isolated because of deteriorating physical or mental health or changing social circumstances. Conditions may include: Dementia, Parkinsons, Stroke, Isolation, Injuries, Anxiety, Depression, Post Traumatic Stress, Chronic Pain, Cancer, Heart & Lung Conditions and others.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £56,059
Total expenditure: £44,494

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 August 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charlotte Ruth Woodcock Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Andrew James Woodcock Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Harry William Ridgewell Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Susan Spencer Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
ROSEMARY ELIZABETH LOCKYER Trustee 15 August 2019
None on record
Julie Ann Plumley Trustee 15 August 2019
None on record
REVEREND JONATHAN PATRICK HERBERT Trustee 15 August 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £29.51k £21.98k £35.49k £56.06k
Total expenditure £3 £16.37k £35.28k £44.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £28.50k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 31 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 31 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 13 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 13 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 01 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 01 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 03 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 03 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RYLANDS
HOLNEST
SHERBORNE
DT9 5PS
Phone:
01963210703