KINGSTON COMMUNITY REFUGEE SPONSORSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Resettling refugee families according to the provisions of the Community Sponsorship scheme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 05 June 2018: CIO registration
- KINGSTON COMMUNITY REFUGEE SPONSORHIP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor VINCENT DAVID DALY | Chair | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev SANDRA ANNE CRAGG | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Karl Aidan Rutlidge | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|||||
ISOBEL JOAN ROBINSON | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr FREDERICK SCOTT ASHMORE | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRANT FREDERICK VANSTONE | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARY HOLDSWORTH | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.57k | £807 | £3.20k | £11.72k | £1.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175 | £138 | £14.27k | £5.38k | £2.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH OF THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM OR GRANTED LEAVE TO REMAIN IN THE UK WHO RESIDE OR WISH TO RESIDE TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES OR THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING AID, ACCOMMODATION, SUPPORT AND EDUCATION AND BY FACILITATING THE INTEGRATION OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS INTO THE WIDER COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Grange Road
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
Surrey
KT1 2QU
- Phone:
- 07813799475
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window