Accounts and annual returns HOLDERNESS LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1178505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 16 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 16 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 10 March 2025 314 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 15 April 2025 350 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 17 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 17 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 09 May 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 11 May 2022 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 03 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window