HOLY BIBLE GRACE MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Christian religion mainly, but not exclusively, by means of broadcasting Christian messages of an evangelistic and teaching nature for the benefit of the public through the holding of prayer meetings, lectures, public celebration of religious festivals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 2018: CIO registration
- HOLY BIBLE CHURCH MINISTRY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Minister Stellamaris Sofia Omoregie | Trustee | 27 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pastor Mrs Gloria Emwen | Trustee | 27 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Evangelist Aghimen Oliver Omobude | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.67k | £9.80k | £6.66k | £6.57k | £4.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.85k | £7.64k | £9.70k | £7.64k | £5.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Apr 2018 as amended on 05 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING CHRISTIAN MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIAN RELIGION TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITHIN THE WIDER COMMUNITY AND BY INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY. 3) RELIEF OF POVERTY AND PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION, BY PROVIDING: A. EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND IN VOCATIONAL SKILLS; B. SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY; C. ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16A MIDDLETON GARDENS
MIDDLETON
MANCHESTER
M24 4DF
- Phone:
- 07459622289
- Email:
- omobudevisa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window