Triratna South East Buddhist Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the advancement of the Buddhist religion through a programme of classes and events, both for regular members of our group as well as for newcomers from the local community and others, the Triratna West Kent Buddhist Group provides an understanding of Buddhism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 14 September 2018: CIO registration
- 22 December 2021: Funds received from 1186353 TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY EASTBOURNE
- TRIRATNA WEST KENT BUDDHIST GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS PETER HOLLOWAY | Chair | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Magaret Smith | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Kate Moyse | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Satyamati Dharmacharini | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catharine Jane Bolger | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Lowit | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Stretton | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dharmacharini NAGARAKSHITA DHARMACHARINI ANDREWES | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
BERYL MOULD | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.24k | £2.58k | £6.47k | £17.81k | £16.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.22k | £3.06k | £4.22k | £13.70k | £12.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Sep 2018 as amended on 06 Oct 2020 as amended on 15 Jun 2021 as amended on 15 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO SUPPORT THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. ENCOURAGING MEMBERS AND OTHERS TO LIVE ETHICAL LIVES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE BUDDHA; 2. SUPPORTING ORDAINED MEMBERS OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY AND OTHER DULY ORDAINED BUDDHISTS, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE COUNCIL OF THE CIO; 3. MAINTAINING CLOSE COMMUNICATION WITH AND WORKING UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST ORDER AND IN CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER GROUPS WITH THE SAME OBJECTS; AND 4. USING APPLICATIONS OF THE BUDDHAÆS TEACHING TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF ALL. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
104 FARMCOMBE ROAD
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN2 5DL
- Phone:
- 07968668409
- Email:
- wkbg@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window