Financial history NURSES REACHING OUT

Charity number: 1177890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.74k £8.12k £9.49k £7.82k £6.44k
Total expenditure £8.50k £10.95k £10.40k £8.55k £5.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A