MOORMEAD COMMUNITY & SPORTS PAVILION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Moormead Community & Sports Pavilion's (Moormead CSP) mission is to provide facilities for the benefit of the local community to enable recreation or other leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,128 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 17 September 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARIESH SHARMA | Chair | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Prendergast | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philip Egan | Trustee | 22 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Gould | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wilson | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa James | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Harris | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
LAWRENCE POWER | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SHEEHAN | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.07k | £4.22k | £1.60k | £0 | £16.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.87k | £10.48k | £185 | £313 | £6.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Sep 2018 as amended on 20 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS IN TWICKENHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TWICKENHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATING IN (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) FOOTBALL, CRICKET, ATHLETICS AND CYCLING. 3) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC TOILET FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AT MOORMEAD COMMUNITY & SPORTS PAVILION, MOORMEAD PARK, TWICKENHAM.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND
CIVIC CENTRE
44 YORK STREET
TWICKENHAM
TW1 3BZ
- Phone:
- 02088316133
- Email:
- hello@mcsp.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window