WYRE FOREST DISTRICT PHAB CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BINGO, QUIZ NIGHTS, GAMES, SKITTLES,TALKS, MUSIC NIGHTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 April 1982: Standard registration
- WYRE FOREST P H A B CLUB (Working name)
- WYRE FOREST PHAB (Working name)
- WYRE FOREST PHAB CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEONARD JOHN COLLINS | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRADLEY WILLIAM GAMMOND | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEAN KENNETH MAYALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR DAVE SWANSBOROUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £823 | £170 | £173 | £749 | £677 | |
|
Total expenditure | £479 | £0 | £45 | £506 | £461 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 APRIL 1977 AS AMENED 28 JANUARY 1982
Charitable objects
SHALL BE THE RELIEF OF ILLNESS, SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE WYRE FOREST BY BRINGING SUCH PERSONS INTO CLOSER ASSOCIATION WITH ABLE-BODIED PEOPLE AND THE PROVISION OF, OR ASSITANCE IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
WYRE FOREST
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PADDOCK
CALLOW HILL
ROCK
KIDDERMINSTER
DY14 9DB
- Phone:
- 01299266832
- Email:
- wyconski@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window