CYLCH MEITHRIN PENCADER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cylch Meithrin Pencader is an education setting for 2 year olds until the term they turn 4 years old and commence primary school. The Cylch Meithrin is attached to Caer' Felin Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £13,163 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 14 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catryn Horwood | Chair | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eifion Rhys Davies | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|||||
MERERID W MORGAN | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.71k | £41.54k | £25.62k | £23.88k | £31.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.59k | £26.21k | £22.89k | £30.45k | £24.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.76k | £1.53k | N/A | £13.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 July 2021 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 July 2021 | 170 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN IN PENCADER THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE WELSH LANGUAGE. A) PROVIDING AND PRESENTING SAFE AND SATISFYING PLAY AND ACTIVITIES B) ARRANGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES IN ORDER TO HELP PARENTS SUPPORT THEIR CHILDREN, AND C) PROMOTING THE AIMS OF MUDIAD YSGOLION MEITHRIN AND PRESENTING THEM TO PARENTS/GUARDIANS; ENCOURAGING THEM TO SEND THEIR CHILDREN ON TO WELSH MEDIUM EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ysgol Gymunedol Cae'r Felin
Pencader
CARMARTHEN
SA39 9AA
- Phone:
- 01559389151
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window