Impact Thame

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We want all people, young and old, to have the opportunity to hear the Good News of Jesus and his love. Helping Thame churches do big things together, we run fun events for children, young people and families at key points in the year to make Jesus known in our community. Our vision is for children, young people and their families to have the opportunity to know Jesus as their Saviour and friend.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £158 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
61 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 08 August 2018: CIO registration
- LIGHTHOUSE THAME AND VILLAGES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PATRICK JOEL HARRIS | Chair | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julie Fox | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Powys-Smith | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGARET CIVVAL | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
CATHERINE ENTICKNAP | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33 | £3.54k | £51 | £959 | £3.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.35k | £291 | £1.24k | £2.24k | £5.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £158 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 08 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAY 2023 AS AMENDED ON 29 SEP 2023 AS AMENDED ON 29 SEP 2023 AMENDED ON 22 SEP 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND FAMILIES IN THE AREA OF THAME AND ITS SURROUNDING VILLAGES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY A COMBINATION OF TEACHING, PERFORMING ARTS, MUSIC, PHYSICAL ACTIVITIES AND CRAFTS IN A WAY WHICH PROMOTES THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND ENCOURAGES CHURCHES TO WORK TOGETHER TO PROMOTE UNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Black Horse Cottage
Manor Road
Towersey
THAME
Oxfordshire
OX9 3QR
- Phone:
- 01844 317871
- Email:
- hello@impactthame.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window