FRIENDS OF KEW HOUSE SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Carry out fundraising ventures with Kew House School parents at social events to help our nominated charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Hounslow
Governance
- 15 May 2018: Standard registration
- 26 April 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.99k | £5.62k | £820 | £41.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.35k | £14.65k | £6.25k | £42.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 02 October 2023 | 124 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: (2.1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. (2.2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window