Financial history DJM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1178383
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £4.17k £9 £875 £2.00k £460
Total expenditure £3.28k £1.00k £1.15k £390 £1.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A