BOLTON SMILEY FACES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bolton Smiley Faces provide monthly support group meetings with activities to support children who have Downs Syndrome living in Bolton and the surrounding areas to include speech therapy, art therapy, signalong, activities to support development of fine and gross motor skills. We also provide family activities during school holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Wigan
Governance
- 20 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE GRADY | Chair | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Macdonald | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Mitchell | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
CATH HOLT | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
CARL PHILIP GOODMAN | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNY MATHER | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE COOPER | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHARON CROWLEY | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN CHADWICK | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
EMMA LIGGETT | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.98k | £15.85k | £16.54k | £6.95k | £18.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.90k | £13.13k | £7.28k | £6.88k | £6.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 22 January 2023 | 351 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH DOWN’S SYNDROME, THEIR PARENTS OR CARERS LIVING IN THE BOLTON AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, ADVICE, TRAINING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, WITH A VIEW TO CREATING AND DEVELOPING CONDITIONS WHICH WILL ENABLE CHILDREN WITH DOWN'S SYNDROME TO ATTAIN THEIR FULL POTENTIAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Victory Road
Little Lever
BOLTON
BL3 1QY
- Phone:
- 07919021873
- Email:
- boltonsmileyfaces@gmail.com
- Website:
-
boltonsmileyfaces.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window