SEVENOAKS GOSPEL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sevenoaks Gospel Trust is a funding trust, supporting evangelical Christian ministry in Sevenoaks and the surrounding areas. This can be by providing grants, loans or other funding, or by acquiring or renting property and making it available for use. We carry out our activities in accordance with our Grant Making policy and Statement of Faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 24 July 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK DOMINIC HARDING | Chair | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Reid | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter John Rees | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|||||
PAUL ANTHONY BATCHELOR | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|||||
GAVIN BRIAN WATSON | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH JAEL DRURY | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £198.44k | £137.38k | £90.79k | £651.87k | £93.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.44k | £21.05k | £16.68k | £16.73k | £8.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £632.70k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.23k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.94k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.73k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH, INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY PROVIDING GRANTS OR OTHER FUNDING TO, AND MAKING AVAILABLE PROPERTY FOR USE BY, CHURCHES AND OTHER CHRISTIAN CHARITIES OR GROUPS IN PARTICULAR IN THE SEVENOAKS AREA THAT ARE IN SYMPATHY WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Langdale
Morleys Road
Weald
Sevenoaks
Kent
TN14 6QX
- Phone:
- 01732750874
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window