Dalton District Guide Headquarters

Charity number: 512087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Guiding activities for girls and women from age 4yrs upwards

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,137
Total expenditure: £16,862

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DALTON DISTRICT (Working name)
  • DALTON AND ASKAM DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
  • DUDDON DIVISION GUIDE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Penny Wall Chair
None on record
Michelle Johnson Trustee 27 October 2024
CUMBRIA SOUTH GIRL GUIDES
Received: On time
MILLOM DISTRICT GUIDES
Received: On time
Alison Janet Forbes Kennedy Trustee 22 January 2020
None on record
KATHRYN MARY COID Trustee
None on record
JANE VICTORIA WEARING Trustee
None on record
SARAH ELIZABETH BEALE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.31k £13.14k £20.70k £7.99k £7.14k
Total expenditure £6.22k £9.35k £9.40k £20.72k £16.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £17.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 MAIDENLANDS CRESCENT
DALTON-IN-FURNESS
LA15 8UD
Phone:
01229464559
Website:

No information available