Financial history CHEAFRICA LIMITED

Charity number: 1181388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £658 £2.40k £350 £202 £0
Total expenditure £8.87k £6.27k £1.33k £1.14k £3.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A