Financial history EGLWYSWRW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 512095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.76k £16.53k £11.24k £10.61k £8.72k
Total expenditure £2.63k £3.72k £2.62k £7.42k £8.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.50k £10.00k £3.96k N/A