Financial history BIRCHANGER WOOD TRUST 2018

Charity number: 1178590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.73k £7.73k £14.39k £16.44k £20.40k
Total expenditure £6.11k £3.42k £8.25k £32.50k £16.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 £3.95k