BIRCHANGER WOOD TRUST 2018

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) PROMOTE CONSERVATION PROTECTION & IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL & NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF BIRCHANGER WOOD 2) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN NATURAL HISTORY OF FLORA AND FAUNA OF THE WOOD 3) ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION, LEISURE & IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE LIVING, WORKING, & VISITING THE WOOD
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,951 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 31 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL NOLAN | Chair | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Walker | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Smith | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
LINDA JEAN POCKLINGTON | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN MEGER | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL BRETT | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr PHILIPPA ALLEN | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN FORGHAM | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLIN BERNARD WOODWARD MBA | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr ROGER WILMOT | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|||||
PATRICK FORREST | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.73k | £7.73k | £14.39k | £16.44k | £20.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.11k | £3.42k | £8.25k | £32.50k | £16.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | £3.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 May 2018
Charitable objects
THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME ARE TO BE HELD ON TRUST TO BE APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC 1)TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE ANCIENT WOODLAND OF BIRCHANGER WOOD 2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE NATURAL HISTORY OF THE FLORA AND FAUNA OF THE ANCIENT WOODLAND OF BIRCHANGER WOOD 3)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE LIVING OR WORKING AND VISITORS TO THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Galloway Close
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Hertfordshire
CM23 2HT
- Phone:
- 01279817974
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window