Accounts and annual returns THE BEVINGTON TRUST

Charity number: 1179713
Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 April 2025 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 April 2025 440 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 April 2025 805 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window