NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME BURGESSES LANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manages the funds of, and distributes surplus income to the burgesses of Newcastle-Under-Lyme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 07 December 1981: Standard registration
- NEWCASTLE-UNDER-LYME BURGESSES LANDS (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael James Dowler | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Griffiths | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barry Shufflebotham | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ernest Kettle | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christian Allan Kettle | Trustee | 04 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Griffiths | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Mark Davis | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Bailey | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Smith | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM BARTLETT EMERY | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN KETTLE | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD VERNON | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES LINDEN DOWLER | Trustee | 28 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY MILLWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM DAVID MILLWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES ENOS WHITTAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MELVYN JOHN KETTLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.66k | £28.45k | £28.40k | £27.75k | £29.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.20k | £26.39k | £9.84k | £10.50k | £12.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 December 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 November 2024 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13/08/1859 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15/05/2012
Charitable objects
MANAGEMENT OF ASSETS VESTED IN THE TRUSTEES AND THE DISTRIBUTION OF NET INCOME AMONGST THOSE ENTITLED BY VIRTUE OF THE 1859 ACT.
Area of benefit
NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME
Contact information
- Address:
-
Knights Solicitors Llp
The Brampton
Newcastle
ST5 0QW
- Phone:
- 01782619225
- Email:
- djmiller6@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window