THE MILTON KEYNES ISLAMIC AND CULTURAL ASSOCIATION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a faith-based charity based in England, United Kingdom. We manage a Community Center and mosque operating from a building owned by the charity in Central Milton Keynes. In addition to the daily prayers at the mosque, we also provide other services such as Islamic funerals, ceremonies, festivals and Islamic education for both adults and children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 19 November 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ahmed Sheikh Hassan Khalif | Chair | 19 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Ali Ahmed Jama | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Bishar Khamis Adan | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Idris Abdinasir | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|||||
MOHAMED ALI WADAD | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
IBRAHIM ABDULAHI ABDIQADIR | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Farhaan Muhumed Awas | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.11k | £66.77k | £65.68k | £215.23k | £241.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.24k | £37.49k | £43.46k | £84.87k | £84.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 29 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 29 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 07 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 07 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE Ò THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN MILTON KEYNES AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR A MASJID, CEREMONIES, MUSLIM FESTIVALS AND MADRASSA. Ò THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PERSONS OF THE MUSLIM FAITH RESIDENT IN MILTON KEYNES. Ò TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PRAYER, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF MEMBERS OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE; AND Ò SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 WEYBOURNE ROAD
BROUGHTON
MILTON KEYNES
MK10 9ND
- Phone:
- 07957128099
- Email:
- info@mkica.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window