CHABAD LUBAVITCH LEICESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We advance the education and wellbeing of the general public in the subject of Cultural and Historic Jewish Heritage by through lectures, talks, programs and events. We operate primarily in the East Midlands
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Belgium
- France
- Israel
- Scotland
- South Africa
- United States
Governance
- 21 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP PINK | Chair | 11 February 2018 |
|
|||||
BROCHA LENT | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL DUBOY | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|||||
RIFKA WINEBERG | Trustee | 11 February 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.96k | £58.50k | £41.49k | £83.13k | £71.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.44k | £31.97k | £34.63k | £71.53k | £62.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Feb 2019 as amended on 25 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO 1. ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF CULTURAL AND HISTORIC JEWISH HERITAGE BY LECTURES, TALKS, EVENTS AND GRANTS 2. ADVANCE THE PRACTICE OF THE JEWISH RELIGION
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 STANLEY ROAD
LEICESTER
LE2 1RE
- Phone:
- 01162706622
- Email:
- chabadleicester@gmail.com
- Website:
-
chabadleicester.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window