Financial history COMBAT CANCER

Charity number: 1178293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.73k £27.08k £33.05k £47.73k £55.11k
Total expenditure £11.37k £22.17k £14.20k £32.97k £57.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A