Y CWMNI SIARAD / THE TALKING COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of mental distress for the public benefit of people living in Wales in particular but not exclusively by the provision of evidence based, accessible psychological therapies, counselling and support services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bridgend
- Cardiff
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 15 February 2019: CIO registration
- YCS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Hurley-Tyres | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michele Ryan | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Charlton | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Lee Parfitt | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Rachael George | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.79k | £124.41k | £62.52k | £112.96k | £141.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.10k | £89.47k | £112.88k | £121.08k | £123.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF MENTAL DISTRESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN WALES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EVIDENCE BASED, ACCESSIBLE PSYCHOLOGICAL THERAPIES, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT SERVICES. 2. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN WALES WHO EXPERIENCE MENTAL DISTRESS BY PREVENTING THEM FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY INVOLVING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED GROUPS IN EVALUATING AND DESIGNING MENTAL WELLBEING SERVICES THAT ENABLE INCREASED ACCESS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Y CWMNI SIARAD
YCS THERAPY CENTRE
31 The Parade
Roath
CARDIFF
CF24 3AD
- Phone:
- 07763120331
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window