Accounts and annual returns AIDEN'S FUNDS FOR FUN

Charity number: 1178316
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 27 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 27 August 2024 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 25 April 2023 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 04 May 2022 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 25 March 2021 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required