COMMUNITY NEEDS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the charity are provisions of relief to those in need anywhere in the world by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, or social or economic disadvantage in particular but not exclusive by coordinating and developing services such as, the provision of Bedding, food, clothing and such other services for those in need as the Trustees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Greenwich
Governance
- 11 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BABATUNDE ANTHONY OYELAKIN | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
TONIA TAIWO OYENEYE | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
COMFORT RONKE AGBENLA | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120 | £10.66k | £11.28k | £13.11k | £23.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £273 | £7.56k | £6.69k | £11.28k | £14.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 May 2018
Charitable objects
AS AN EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF GREENWICH BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY COORDINATING AND DEVELOPING SERVICES SUCH AS, THE PROVISION OF BEDDING, CLOTHING, FOOD AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES FOR THOSE IN NEED AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
105 NEWMARSH ROAD
LONDON
SE28 8TA
- Phone:
- 07957444804
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window