FINDING RAINBOWS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the mental and physical sickness of persons resident in the United Kingdom suffering from bereavement or loss by the provision of counselling and support for such persons. To advance the education of the public in the subject of bereavement or loss.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 11 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anya Zinkivskay | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janis Teresa Ridehalgh | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
TRACY BOOTH | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
GARETH PAUL | Trustee | 12 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
LEE JAMES COOK | Trustee | 12 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JADE CHANTELLE BARKER | Trustee | 12 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 11/10/2021 | 11/10/2022 | 11/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.94k | £2.34k | £58.66k | £55.82k | £42.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.98k | £6.02k | £19.67k | £39.32k | £67.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £42.75k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 October 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 October 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 October 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 October 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 October 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 October 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Fletcher Street
ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE
Lancashire
OL6 6BY
- Phone:
- 07340799387
- Email:
- finding.rainbows@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window