Financial history ATTLEBOROUGH 2013 LIONS CLUB

Charity number: 1178941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.57k £1.92k £2.87k £3.00k £2.72k
Total expenditure £3.14k £943 £1.71k £2.72k £2.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A