PORTSMOUTH PRIDE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Portsmouth Pride Ethos is to create a safe space and celebrate the diversity of our amazing city and residents, inclusive of all; regardless of sexual orientations, gender, ethnicities, ages, races, or disabilities. Pride is more than just one day.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 29 August 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natalia Aslam | Chair | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Rosin White | Trustee | 20 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ryan McCormmick | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Pitts | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Robert Hickin | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Parker | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.60k | £2.08k | £3.51k | £80.82k | £144.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.49k | £5.16k | £4.74k | £40.74k | £90.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 APR 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER IDENTITY, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1)RAISING THE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO ALL ASPECTS OF DISCRIMINATION IN SOCIETY AND OF THE ISSUES AND DIFFICULTIES AFFECTING THE LIVES OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER (LGBTQ+) PEOPLE; 2)CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY THROUGH CELEBRATING THE ACHIEVEMENTS OF LGBTQ+ PEOPLE AND THE DIVERSITY OF THE LGBTQ+ COMMUNITY; 3)ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WHETHER BY TEACHING, INTERACTION, PERFORMANCE OR PRODUCING AND/OR DISPLAYING ARTISTIC AND OTHER MATERIALS; 4)PRODUCING PUBLICATIONS, LECTURES, MEDIA, PROMOTING PUBLIC EVENTS AND EXHIBITIONS, PUBLIC ADVOCACY AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION; 5)ASSOCIATING WITH VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND PUBLIC AND PRIVATE BODIES TO DEVELOP AND MAXIMISE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS RUN BY AND FOR LGBTQ+ PEOPLE; 6)STAGING AND PROMOTING LGBTQ+ EVENTS AND IN PARTICULAR AN ANNUAL LGBTQ+ FESTIVAL; 7)PROMOTING AND PROVIDING RESOURCES WHERE NECESSARY FOR PROVIDING EQUALITY OF ACCESS FOR MEMBERS OF THE LGBTQ+ COMMUNITY TO SPORT, TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT, BUSINESS OR SIMILAR OPPORTUNITIES WHERE THERE ARE BARRIERS TO EQUAL ACCESS FOR THE TIME BEING; 8)PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; 9)CONDUCTION OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Portsmouth Pride Trust
Create at Playland
1-6 City Buildings
Commercial Road
PO1 4BD
- Phone:
- 07931351170
- Email:
- info@portsmouthpride.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window