CLEOBURY MORTIMER MEN'S SHED ("CMMS")

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cleobury Mortimer Men's Shed (CMMS) aims to combat loneliness and isolation in men over 18 and alleviate the associated health conditions, including mental health issues, faced by men. We provide a safe, purpose built workshop, built by the charity where men can work, learn and share their knowledge working shoulder to shoulder.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Shropshire
Governance
- 24 April 2018: CIO registration
- CLEOBURY MORTIMER MEN'S SHED (Previous name)
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER FRANK BLACKBURN | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Raymond Kerry | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Auchterlonie Reid | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Edgar Reynolds | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Tolley | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Guy James | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATJA JONES | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gwilym Howard Leslie Butler | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.51k | £17.93k | £18.77k | £4.87k | £1.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.22k | £9.79k | £15.41k | £3.92k | £2.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £250 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 March 2025 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 March 2025 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEN AGED 18 OR OVER, WITHIN CLEOBURY MORTIMER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET JOINTLY OR INDIVIDUALLY TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL).
Contact information
- Address:
-
PUDDING MEADOW COTTAGE
EAGLE LANE
CLEOBURY MORTIMER
PUDDING MEADOW COTTAGE
EAGLE LANE
DY14 8RA
- Phone:
- 07776243584
- Email:
- cmms.membership@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window