Trustees CLEOBURY MORTIMER MEN'S SHED ("CMMS")
Charity number: 1178085

Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER FRANK BLACKBURN | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Raymond Kerry | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Auchterlonie Reid | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Edgar Reynolds | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Tolley | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Guy James | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATJA JONES | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gwilym Howard Leslie Butler | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.