Young Leaders Academy

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We deliver a leadership development programme for young people which operates in the London Borough of Brent and Lewisham. We design a special curriculum around our young leaders which develops leadership and life skills for them. We offer a range of different experiences from sports to academic and we also offer trips and have a number of guest speakers delivering workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 January 2019: Standard registration
- Young Leaders Academy (Working name)
- THE WESTSIDE YOUNG LEADER'S ACADEMY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon May Thomas | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Amaning | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leanard Philip | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Blagrove | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.56k | £12.65k | £149.10k | £172.31k | £182.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.96k | £11.55k | £115.97k | £148.20k | £197.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £89.58k | £53.67k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 APR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 DEC 2018 as amended on 14 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 LIVING IN GREATER LONDON BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tall Horse Accountants
SBC House
Restmor Way
Wallington
SM6 7AH
- Phone:
- 07956087021
- Email:
- wylacademy@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window