MILTON KEYNES CHORALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are to advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music in all its aspects by any means the trustees see fit, including through the presentation of public concerts and recitals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 April 2018: CIO registration
- 06 September 2019: Funds received from 268507 MILTON KEYNES CHORALE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Swann | Chair | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dalmais | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Moss | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Lucy Morris | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Pembery | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Jane Kitchen | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jacky Holloway | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dyer | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
CYRIL WOOD | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Wilkinson | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Glenys Bloomfield | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.82k | £2.90k | £42.51k | £37.44k | £41.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.59k | £12.83k | £51.50k | £33.36k | £38.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Apr 2018 as amended on 15 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 MERINO GREEN
OAKRIDGE PARK
MILTON KEYNES
MK14 6FL
- Phone:
- 01908222232
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window