Trustees MILTON KEYNES CHORALE
Charity Number: 1178002

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Swann | Chair | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dalmais | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Moss | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Lucy Morris | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Pembery | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Jane Kitchen | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jacky Holloway | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dyer | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
CYRIL WOOD | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Wilkinson | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Glenys Bloomfield | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.