Accounts and annual returns PROVIDENCE *

Charity number: 1178822
Charity reporting is overdue by 804 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 73 days
Accounts and TAR 16 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 73 days
Annual return 16 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 439 days
Accounts and TAR 16 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 439 days
Annual return 16 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 804 days
Accounts and TAR 16 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 804 days
Annual return 16 April 2021 02 March 2022 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 April 2021 02 March 2022 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 16 April 2020 05 April 2021 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 April 2020 05 April 2021 48 days late Download Open in new window