EAST MIDLANDS MINISTRY TRAINING COURSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training in Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 19 January 1982: Standard registration
- 07 November 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- EMMTC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £283.39k | £292.84k | £293.98k | £239.88k | £146.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £265.50k | £300.31k | £284.03k | £261.93k | £162.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 12 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 07 January 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 01 July 2011 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 30 June 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 25 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 17 June 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JUNE 1980 AS AMENDED 12 DECEMBER 1980, 20 MARCH 1981 AND 4 DECEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
TO TRAIN MATURE STUDENTS SPONSERED BY THE CHURCHES OF THE EAST MIDLAND FOR ORDAINED AND LAY MINISTRY, AND ALSO ANY OTHER STUDENTS WHO MAY WICH TO UNDERTAKE THE SAME TRAINING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window