LIVING WORD CHRISTIAN CENTRE -AFMIM UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a charity that operate in Gravesend community area. We rent facilities from Mayfield school where we meet for our usual meetings. We carry out charitable work within our community providing social services to the less privileged groups of people such as providing food for food banks distribution within the the Gravesend area and other charitable services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 16 October 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMBARASHE FIELD HUMBASHA | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tendai Douglas Svotwa | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHIEDZA CHIGIDI | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £409 | £660 | £3.36k | £5.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.20k | £1.75k | £4.08k | £4.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2023 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2023 | 541 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 July 2023 | 906 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 May 2022 | 459 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JAN 2015
Charitable objects
A. TO PREPARE AND RECEIVE PEOPLE AS MEMBERS, TO LAY DOWN RULES FOR THEM AND TO ESTABLISH ASSEMBLIES. B. TO PROMOTE FELLOWSHIP AND FOSTER UNITY AMONGST ALL THE AFMIM (UK) ASSEMBLIES BASED ON THE COMMON CONFESSION OF FAITH BY ORGANIZING SPIRITUAL CONFERENCES, WORKSHOPS, SEMINARS AND MEETINGS AMONGST THE MEMBER CHURCHES. C. TO ESTABLISH VARIOUS ASSEMBLY BOARDS, COMMITTEES AND ASSOCIATIONS THAT MAY BE CONSIDERED NECESSARY. D. TO PROVIDE THE FORUM THROUGH WHICH ASSEMBLIES CAN WORK TOGETHER AT LOCAL, REGIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL LEVELS TO SPREAD THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST AND REACH OUT TO THE WHOLE WORLD THROUGH MISSIONS AND EVANGELISM. E. TO CO-ORDINATE AND FACILITATE THE SHARING OF RESOURCES AND FACILITIES IN THE AREAS OF CONSTITUTIONAL DEVELOPMENT, TRAINING, HUMAN AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT, WELFARE, EMERGENCY RELIEF IN NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL DISASTERS, MISSIONS, YOUTH, CHILDREN'S MINISTRY AND ANY OTHER MINISTRY OR OTHER RELATED MATTERS OF CONCERN. F. TO USE ALL FORMS OF COMMUNICATION, INCLUDING BOTH PRINT AND ELECTRONIC MEDIA TO SHARE EXPERIENCES, SPREAD THE GOSPEL TO THE END OF THE WORLD AS WELL AS DISSEMINATE INFORMATION AMONGST MEMBER CHURCHES. G. TO ENTER INTO ECUMENICAL RELATIONS WITH OTHER CHURCHES OR CHURCH ORGANISATIONS BASED ON: I. COMMON AIMS AND OBJECTIVES II. COMMITMENT TO JESUS CHRIST AS LORD AND SAVIOUR H. TO TRAIN, LEGITIMATE AND ORDAIN PASTORS AND VOLUNTARY LAY-WORKERS (ELDERS AND DEACONS). I. TO FOUND AND ESTABLISH BIBLE COLLEGES, TRAINING CENTERS, OR ANY OTHER INSTITUTION DEEMED AS SPIRITUALLY OR TEMPORALLY IMPORTANT FOR THE CHURCH. J. TO INSTITUTE, CONDUCT OR DEFEND, ABANDON OR COMPOUND ANY LAWSUIT, ACTION OR PROCEEDINGS INSTITUTED BY LAW OR AGAINST THE CHURCH IN ANY COURT OF LAW, AS DEFINED IN THE REGULATIONS. K. WHERE IT IS DEEMED IN THE INTEREST OF THE CHURCH AND IN LINE WITH THE UK CHARITY COMMISSION LAWS. I. TO CONCLUDE ANY TRANSACTIONS OF PURCHASE, SELL, HIRE AND LETTING OF PROPERTIES, II. TO ENTER INTO, GRANT, SIGN, MAKE OR EXECUTE ALL SUCH AGREEMENTS, CONTRACTS, POWERS OF ATTORNEY, DEEDS AND OTHER INSTRUMENTS THAT MAY BE DEEMED EXPEDIENT OR NECESSARY. L. TO RECEIVE, BORROW, SPEND, LEND OR INVEST MONIES, AND TO OPEN AND CLOSE BANK AND OTHER ACCOUNTS. M. TO ADVANCE THE KINGDOM OF OUR LORD AND SAVIOUR JESUS CHRIST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 Pear Tree Orchard
Bapchild
SITTINGBOURNE
Kent
ME10 4GP
- Phone:
- 07946350394
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window