Accounts and annual returns CHOICE THROUGH EDUCATION UK

Charity number: 1180314
Charity reporting is up to date (94 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 February 2025 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 02 February 2025 94 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 February 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 February 2024 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window