Financial history CHOICE THROUGH EDUCATION UK

Charity number: 1180314
Charity reporting is up to date (94 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £67.93k £11.44k £15.57k £11.14k £34.87k
Total expenditure £64.21k £10.79k £18.86k £11.08k £27.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A