CHOICE THROUGH EDUCATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention of poverty or financial hardship anywhere in the world, by providing or assisting in the provision of education, training, health care projects and other facilities and support designed to enable individuals to generate a sustainable usage and be self-sufficient; advance the education of children and young people who are socially and economically or socially disadvantaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
- Uganda
Governance
- 15 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WAYNE COLLINS | Chair | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
GLYNNIS CECILIA WISBEY | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
BARRY VINCENT THOMAS | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.93k | £11.44k | £15.57k | £11.14k | £34.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.21k | £10.79k | £18.86k | £11.08k | £27.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 February 2025 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 February 2025 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 February 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 February 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND OTHER FACILITIES AND SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; AND 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY OR JUST SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN KENYA, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dynamix Accountancy
Dane John Works
Gordon Road
CANTERBURY
Kent
CT1 3PP
- Phone:
- 07815157080
- Email:
- wayne@cte.uk.com
- Website:
-
None
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window