ISHAMI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ishami Foundation uses the power of sport and storytelling to build equality, tolerance and lasting peace in Rwanda and the UK. We work with survivors, young people and vulnerable communities. Our activities empower participants by fostering respect, team spirit, critical thinking and resilience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Rwanda
Governance
- 28 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Andrew Wallis | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ryumugabe | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Naila Amida Kira | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joel Freedman | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.85k | £6.53k | £25.50k | £9.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.42k | £5.85k | £11.00k | £16.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £25.00k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 October 2023 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 01 October 2023 | 154 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 May 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 02 May 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN THE UK AND RWANDA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) WORKING WITH PARTNERS TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION, PARTICULARLY ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, ETHNIC GROUP OR GENDER; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) PROMOTING SPORTING ACTIVITIES, IN PARTICULAR FOOTBALL TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; AND (D) DRAWING ON GENOCIDE SURVIVOR STORIES TO HELP CULTIVATE A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE 1994 GENOCIDE AGAINST THE TUTSI IN RWANDA AND OTHER GENOCIDES AND RELATED ISSUES THROUGH SHARING SURVIVOR TESTIMONIES, PARTICIPATING IN EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL EVENTS AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UK AND RWANDA THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, IN PARTICULAR FOOTBALL, PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5th Floor
14-16 Dowgate Hill
London
EC4R 2SU
- Phone:
- 07730538729
- Email:
- info@ishamifoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window