Accounts and annual returns ZOAR CHAPEL FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1180484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2023 20 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2023 20 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 September 2022 04 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2022 04 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 September 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 27 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 September 2020 07 April 2022 280 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 23 May 2022 326 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 September 2019 09 April 2021 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 09 April 2021 282 days late Download Open in new window