ZOAR CHAPEL FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Christian organisation for the propagation of Christian materials and teaching and the use of our facilities for related ceremonies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 30 October 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Dandy | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ANTHONY PHILLIPS | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.54k | £4.39k | £1.43k | £33.00k | £27.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.57k | £2.15k | £2.31k | £27.35k | £24.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 07 April 2022 | 280 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | 23 May 2022 | 326 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 09 April 2021 | 282 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | 09 April 2021 | 282 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOLLOWING DOCTRINES: (I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF CHRISTIANITY MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING CHRISTIANITY MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE; AND (II) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN WEST SUSSEX FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF CHRISTIAN FESTIVALS, AND PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; (B) TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN WEST SUSSEX AND THE SOUTH OF ENGLAND SUFFERING FROM DIFFICULT PERSONAL CIRCUMSTANCES, FOR EXAMPLE BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS, BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS; (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; AND (D) TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG HOMELESS PEOPLE IN WEST SUSSEX BY PROVIDING SHELTER AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chapel House
Petworth Road
Wisborough Green
BILLINGSHURST
RH14 0BH
- Phone:
- 01403 700803
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window