WALKERINGHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 512150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Relief In Need Charity regularly asks for claims for assistance from people in the community who might have a particular need. Information as to how to apply is provided in the village newsletter .

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £921
Total expenditure: £200

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 January 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robin Peter Roberts Chair 01 December 2021
WALKERINGHAM VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD
Received: On time
CHARITY OF IVY OSBORN FOR WIDOWS AND SPINSTERS
Received: On time
WOODHOUSE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DIANE MARIE DERBYSHIRE Trustee 01 December 2021
WOODHOUSE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BECKINGHAM AND DISTRICT GARDENERS' CLUB
Received: On time
CHARITY OF IVY OSBORN FOR WIDOWS AND SPINSTERS
Received: On time
PATRICIA CHESTER Trustee
CHARITY OF IVY OSBORN FOR WIDOWS AND SPINSTERS
Received: On time
WOODHOUSE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CAROL ANN DAVIS Trustee
CHARITY OF IVY OSBORN FOR WIDOWS AND SPINSTERS
Received: On time
WOODHOUSE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MR P HARRISON Trustee
WOODHOUSE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CHARITY OF IVY OSBORN FOR WIDOWS AND SPINSTERS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £431 £455 £77 £674 £921
Total expenditure £0 £400 £0 £0 £200
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 THE BEECHES
STATION ROAD
WALKERINGHAM
DONCASTER
DN10 4JJ
Phone:
01427890848
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available