BOSAVERN COMMUNITY FARM CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the running of talks/workshops/courses/events aimed at educating people, particularly those living in west Cornwall, in subjects relating to farming, conservation, and country crafts. The majority of the activities will use the facilities of Bosavern Community Farm. Also to support improving the facilities at the farm to enhance the education experience for learners/participants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 27 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Massey Stewart | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kate Louise Beckly | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PICKERING | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Charles Willsdon | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Rippon | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £100 | £705 | £10.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £248 | £0 | £976 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 May 2022 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO FARMING, CONSERVATION, AND COUNTRY CRAFTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING COURSES, WORKSHOPS AND TALKS. 2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Tregeseal Hill
St. Just
PENZANCE
Cornwall
TR19 7PX
- Phone:
- 01736785755
- Email:
- bosaverncfc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window