Financial history EAST YORKSHIRE PARENT CARER FORUM

Charity number: 1179499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £25.00k £42.50k £42.18k £49.57k £39.50k
Total expenditure £21.64k £29.81k £55.77k £31.10k £39.66k
Income from government contracts N/A £37.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k N/A £42.18k £47.50k £39.50k