COSMIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COSMIC SUPPORTS THE WORK OF THE NEONATAL AND PAEDIATRIC INTENSIVE CARE SERVICES OF IMPERIAL COLLEGE HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST, LONDON. THE SERVICE OPERATES AT ST MARY'S HOSPITAL, PADDINGTON, AND AT QUEEN CHARLOTTE'S HOSPITAL, HAMMERSMITH. WE PURCHASE LEADING EDGE EQUIPMENT, SUPPORT RESEARCH, FUND STAFF TRAINING AND PROVIDE ACCOMMODATION & EMOTIONAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT FOR PARENTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of Westminster
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- THE WINNICOTT FOUNDATION CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SIMON NADEL | Chair | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Hamerla | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sunit Vinod Godambe | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeanne DiIorio Altberger | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Henry Edward Hugh St George | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Wan | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Mills | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas Lissauer | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Lawrence | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angela Birkin | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.87k | £529.90k | £374.03k | £564.21k | £460.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.81k | £387.29k | £431.99k | £519.51k | £671.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.17k | £16.72k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £444.16k | N/A | £562.17k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £68.42k | N/A | £1.19k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £161 | N/A | £842 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £17.17k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £585 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £311.33k | N/A | £375.22k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £75.96k | N/A | £144.29k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £31.47k | N/A | £26.97k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Oct 2018 as amended on 04 Feb 2020 as amended on 23 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are: 1. to further the charitable purposes of neonatal units and paediatric units at hospitals in London, in particular but not limited to the neonatal unit at St Mary's Hospital, Paddington, London W2 and at Queen Charlotte’s & Chelsea Hospital, Hammersmith, London W12 (the "NICU") and the paediatric unit at St Mary’s Hospital, Paddington, London W2 (the “PICU”) in particular (but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing) for the improvement in the care of newborn babies and of children through the provision of equipment or facilities and for the provision of facilities for the accommodation and support of parents of children being treated in the NICU or the PICU or any additional neonatal or paediatric unit at either hospital or any neonatal or paediatric unit that replaces the function of either of them; and 2. the advancement of medical science for the public benefit and for the promotion of other charitable purposes for the benefit of children.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cosmic
10 London Mews
LONDON
W2 1HY
- Phone:
- 02033126175
- Email:
- info@cosmiccharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window